Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Krimm, Arentz, Buckel, Cox, Mautz, McKay, Metzgar, Otto, and Pippy
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program in the Department of Health to provide grants to certain fire departments and volunteer fire companies to procure cancer screening tests not generally conducted during routine physical exams for the purpose of reducing cancer mortality among professional and volunteer firefighters; requiring the Governor for certain fiscal years to include at least $100,000 in the annual budget for the Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0727
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {766181/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Health - Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {766181/1 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Text - Third - Health - Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules 63
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3901 through 13-3907 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM