Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 Licenses - Surveillance System
Sponsored by
Delegates Wells, Boyce, Bridges, and Conaway
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending in Baltimore City the time during which the Board of License Commissioners may issue a Class A-7 license; altering the hours of operation for a holder of a Class A-7 license; requiring the holder of a Class A-7 license to install and operate a digital surveillance system on the licensed premises in accordance with regulations that the Board adopts; requiring the Board to adopt, in consultation with the Baltimore Police Department, digital surveillance regulations on or before August 15, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0069
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 Licenses - Surveillance System
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/11/2020 1:41 PM