Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunting - Regulated Shooting Areas - Offshore Stationary Blinds and Blind Sites
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the inclusion of a certain licensed offshore stationary blind or blind site in a regulated shooting area; authorizing a person to hunt captive raised mallard ducks from a licensed offshore stationary blind or blind site that is included in a regulated shooting area, subject to certain conditions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1014
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Hunting - Regulated Shooting Areas - Offshore Stationary Blinds and Blind Sites
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/2/2020 10:58 AM