Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Crane Located on State Property - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from property tax for the interest of a person in property that is located on property owned by the State if the personal property is a crane used for cargo handling purposes; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0673
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {705866/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {289734/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Delegates M. Washington, Fennell, and Metzgar
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senators Peters, Manno, and Eckardt
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-18)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {705866/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {289734/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Delegates M. Washington, Fennell, and Metzgar 64
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senators Peters, Manno, and Eckardt 63
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (122-18) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM