Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education) and Delegates McIntosh, Kaiser, B. Barnes, Ebersole, M. Jackson, Luedtke, and Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing, altering, and adding certain provisions of law to implement The Blueprint for Maryland's Future, which is intended to transform Maryland's early childhood, primary, and secondary education system to the levels of high-performing systems around the world; requiring the State and each county to distribute to county boards of education certain amounts of education aid under certain programs in certain fiscal years; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1000
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
Text - First - Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   11-206.3, 1-302,   1-303,   15-126, 17-401 through 17-403, 18-506,   21-204,   21-207, 21-208, 24-801,   5-201,   5-201 through 5-203,   5-202,   5-205,   5-207 through 5-209,   5-210,   5-211,   5-212,   5-213,   5-213.1,   5-214,   5-215,   5-215 through 5-220,   5-216,   5-218,   5-220,   5-221,   5-222, 5-224 through 5-228, 5-229, 5-232, 5-233, 5-234, 5-240, 5-241, 5-401 through 5-412,   6-1001 through 6-1013, 6-112,   6-120,   6-121,   6-124 through 6-126, 7-101.1,   7-125, 7-126, 7-1A-01, 7-1A-03 through 7-1A-10, 7-202.1, 8-414,   9.5-1001 through 9.5-1005, 9.9-102   )
(   2-218.1 )
Last Updated: 2/18/2020 12:00 PM