Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain museums to claim title to property that is on permanent loan or that was loaned for a specified term that has expired by giving notice that the museum is terminating the loan of the property; authorizing a museum to take possession of certain property if the lender fails to respond to a notice provided by certified mail within 60 days; authorizing a museum to acquire a certain lien for the costs of the certain conservation measures taken on the property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0255
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223398/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {223398/1 Adopted 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
Text - Third - Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-801, 16-802, 17-401 through 17-408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM