Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Jalisi, Aumann, Beitzel, Cluster, Mautz, Metzgar, Parrott, Szeliga, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a civil fine for smoking marijuana in public; and providing that smoking marijuana in a public place is a criminal misdemeanor with a fine not exceeding $100.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1036
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-201, 5-601, 5-601.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM