Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Clark, S. Howard, Morgan, and Sophocleus
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a county or municipality may establish specified penalties for failure to comply with a franchise agreement for a cable television system; requiring that a franchise agreement include a service connection requirement for wired broadband service, subject to specified conditions; providing that a specified failure to install wired broadband on request under a service connection requirement of a franchise agreement constitutes a specified breach; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1415 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - Enforcement
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - Enforcement
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 48
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-101, 13-201, 13-205, 13-208, 8-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM