Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting certain youth development organizations and programs from the definition of a child care center; authorizing youth development organizations or programs to provide care for a child who is at least 5 years old who attends a public school; requiring a youth development organization to provide a safe child care environment and have certain policies and requirements; requiring certain youth development organizations and programs to submit annually to the State Department of Education certain information; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {995961/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act)
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {995961/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act)
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Hearing canceled
Age
(   9.5-401,   9.5-401.1 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page