Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Condemnation Authority
Sponsored by
Delegate Branch
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to which a specified certificate of public convenience and necessity is issued for the construction of a specified overhead transmission line to acquire specified property or rights by condemnation; and applying the Act to the construction of an overhead transmission line for which a certificate of public convenience and necessity is required.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0969
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163496/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-29)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Condemnation Authority
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {163496/1 Adopted 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Text - Third - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Condemnation Authority
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (109-29) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM