Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Barron, Crutchfield, and Hettleman
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the elements of murder in the first degree to require that a certain murder be committed by a principal in the first degree in the perpetration of or an attempt to perpetrate a certain crime, rather than any participant in the crime; authorizing a certain person to apply for a review of conviction under certain circumstances; requiring a court to hold a hearing on application for review of conviction to make a certain determination; establishing the Task Force to Study Felony Murder for Principals in the First Degree; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0919
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, October 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-201, 2-204 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:29 PM