Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Credentialing Practices
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Hornberger, and Krebs
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a carrier from imposing a limit on the number of behavioral health providers at a health care facility that may be credentialed to participate on a provider panel.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1101
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {796488/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Credentialing Practices
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Credentialing Practices
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Procedures and Credentialing Practices
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {796488/1 Adopted 57
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Credentialing Practices
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Referred Rules 61
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Credentialing Practices
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM