Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Sponsored by
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting the transfer of a used vehicle from a business entity to a majority owner of the business entity from the requirement to obtain a motor vehicle safety inspection certificate if the vehicle is primarily driven by the majority owner of the business entity and the business entity has been dissolved or is in the process of dissolution.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0681
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {780917/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {780917/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 10:28 AM
Click to return on the top page