Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 1 to 3, the maximum number of apprentice barbers per master barber that a barber shop may employ at the same time; and repealing a limit on the total number of apprentice barbers that a barbershop may employ at the same time.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Barbers - Employment of Apprentice Barbers - Alterations
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 10:28 AM
Click to return on the top page