Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Southern Maryland Code Counties - Towing Companies - Authority to Regulate
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the county commissioners of a code county in the Southern Maryland class to adopt rules and regulations for the licensing, maintenance, and operation of towing companies in the county for specified purposes; authorizing the rules and regulations adopted by the county commissioners to require a person who operates a towing company in the county to obtain a license and pay a specified fee; requiring the county commissioners, before adopting regulations, to hold a public hearing that is advertised in advance; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Counties - Towing Companies - Authority to Regulate
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {440119/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Counties - Towing Companies - Authority to Regulate
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {440119/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Southern Maryland Code Counties - Towing Companies - Authority to Regulate
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Finance 48
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 50
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Text - Chapter - Southern Maryland Code Counties - Towing Companies - Authority to Regulate
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-501 through 11-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM