Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Distribution to Local Boards of Education
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Director of the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, at the end of each fiscal year, to remit money in the unclaimed prize fund to the Comptroller for distribution to each county board of education in the State on a pro rata basis determined by the total lottery sales made in each county; and providing that a distribution from the fund is supplemental to and is not intended to take the place of certain funding for county boards of education.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Distribution to Local Boards of Education
House 2/22/2019 2/25/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM