Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB1326


CH0637

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Exemption for Artificial Hearing Device Earmolds, Equipment, and Parts
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel and Luedtke
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 637
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting from the sales and use tax the sale of custom-made earmolds for artificial hearing devices and any other artificial hearing device-related equipment and parts; and repealing a certain sales and use tax exemption for certain obsolete artificial hearing device-related equipment.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {345069/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 637
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Exemption for Artificial Hearing Device Earmolds, Equipment, and Supplies
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {345069/1 Adopted 46
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax – Exemption for Artificial Hearing Device Earmolds, Equipment, and Parts
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 637
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:37 PM