Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small Business Development Center Network Fund - Minimum Appropriation
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the minimum required appropriation to the Small Business Development Center Network Fund at the University of Maryland, College Park Campus beginning with an appropriation of $1,500,000 in fiscal year 2021 and increasing to $3,000,000 for fiscal year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0243
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Small Business Development Center Network Fund - Minimum Appropriation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Small Business Development Center Network Fund - Minimum Appropriation
House 2/22/2019 2/25/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM