Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate D. Barnes
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to conduct a study of the participation of minority-owned businesses in the alcoholic beverages industry in the State; providing for the inclusion of certain issues in the study; requiring the Office to conduct the study in consultation and cooperation with certain agencies and interests; requiring the Office to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233190/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {233190/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-1) 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:30 PM