Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Carr, Luedtke, Platt, Sanchez, and Tarlau
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 756
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for enforcement only as a secondary offense for a violation of the prohibition under specified circumstances against a person driving a vehicle on a highway with any object, material, or obstruction hanging from the rearview mirror that interferes with the clear view of the driver through the windshield.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0012
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0563 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-29)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 756
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - Enforcement
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - Enforcement
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (111-29) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 756
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - Enforcement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM