Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   HB1343 - 2019RS
   CH0002 - 2020RS
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary and Rosenberg
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2020
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the Handgun Permit Review Board in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; providing the process by which a person who is denied a certain handgun permit or renewal of a permit or whose permit is revoked or limited by the Secretary of State Police may appeal the decision to the Office of Administrative Hearings; requiring the Office of Administrative hearings to make a certain annual report to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2019, through January 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1000
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {282712/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-47)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-16)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Veto overridden (89-49)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Veto overridden (30-16)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
House 2/22/2019 2/25/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {282712/1 Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (87-47) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (30-16) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Veto overridden (89-49)
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Veto overridden (30-16)
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2020
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-302, 5-311, 5-312 )
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 11:33 AM