Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Markell Hendricks Youth Crime Prevention and Diversion Parole Fund – Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Chang, Corderman, Jackson, and McKay
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Markell Hendricks Youth Crime Prevention and Diversion Parole Fund to provide grant assistance to local law enforcement agencies to administer certain programs; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; requiring the Governor to appropriate annually at least $50,000 for the Fund; requiring that priority be given to jurisdictions with the highest number of offenders when determining certain grant recipients; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1732 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {234167/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {103425/4 (Delegate Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {149938/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Public Safety - Youth Crime Prevention and Diversion Parole Fund - Establishment
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {234167/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Washington) Adopted 47
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {103425/4 (Delegate Washington) Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Public Safety - Youth Crime Prevention and Diversion Parole Fund - Establishment
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 48
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {149938/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety – Markell Hendricks Youth Crime Prevention and Diversion Parole Fund – Establishment
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738
Text - Chapter - Public Safety – Markell Hendricks Youth Crime Prevention and Diversion Parole Fund – Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1201 through 4-1203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM