Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Compostable, Degradable, and Biodegradable Plastic Products - Labeling
Sponsored by
Delegate Robinson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling a specified plastic product that is labeled as biodegradable, degradable, or decomposable on or after October 1, 2018, subject to a specified exception; prohibiting a person from selling a specified plastic product labeled as compostable or home compostable on or after October 1, 2018, unless the plastic product meets specified standards; establishing specified penalties; providing for the disposition of specified penalties collected under the Act; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {830918/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-8)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment - Compostable, Degradable, and Biodegradable Plastic Products - Labeling
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {830918/1 Adopted 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 48
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Environment - Compostable, Degradable, and Biodegradable Plastic Products - Labeling
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (120-8) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Text - Chapter - Environment - Compostable, Degradable, and Biodegradable Plastic Products - Labeling
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2101 through 9-2105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM