Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion Events
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a landowner to use a portion of the land subject to an easement to hold certain special occasion events for commercial purposes under certain circumstances; specifying that a certain approval granted by the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation to a landowner to use the land subject to an easement for certain special occasion events for commercial purposes automatically terminates on the sale or transfer of the land subject to the easement; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion Events
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {680619/2 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion Events
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion Events
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion Events
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {680619/2 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion Events
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Text - Chapter - Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion Events
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM