Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County Board of Education - Election and Appointment of Members
Sponsored by
Wicomico County Delegation
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring that, beginning in 2018, members of the Wicomico County Board of Education be elected by districts and members be elected at large, as specified; providing that, alternatively, beginning in 2018, members of the Wicomico County Board of Education be elected by districts and members be appointed, as specified; establishing a School Board Nominating Commission; submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of Wicomico County; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684930/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed 47
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {684930/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-105, 3-114, 3-13A-01 through 3-13A-06 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM