Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Delegates Wivell, Chang, Ciliberti, Corderman, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, McKay, Parrott, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under certain circumstances, the performance of or the attempt to perform a dismemberment abortion that kills an unborn child on a pregnant woman; authorizing a certain individual to seek a hearing before the State Board of Physicians on a certain issue; providing that certain findings of the Board from a certain hearing are admissible on that issue at a certain trial; providing for the delay of a certain trial for a certain purpose for a certain number of days; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1067
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1167 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-217 through 20-223 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM