Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Corderman, Anderton, Barve, Boyce, Buckel, Carr, D.M. Davis, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hornberger, Korman, Krimm, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, McComas, McKay, Palakovich Carr, Parrott, Qi, Reilly, Solomon, Wivell, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Transportation to conduct a study on extending Maryland Area Regional Commuter (MARC) commuter rail service to western Maryland; requiring the Department to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before July 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164862/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation - Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-6)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Transportation - Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension - Study
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {164862/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Transportation - Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension - Study
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-6) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Finance 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:31 PM