Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Forbes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State, for certain construction projects and major renovation projects proposed after December 31, 2020, to require that the project be designed, engineered, and constructed in a manner that allows the roof to withstand the weight of solar panels; requiring certain construction projects and major renovation projects to include the placement of the maximum number of solar panels for which the project was designed; requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to provide certain recommendations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0592
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/11/2020 2:36 PM