Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Optional Retirement Program - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain individuals who are members of the Employees' Pension System of the State Retirement and Pension System from becoming a member of the Optional Retirement Program of the State Retirement and Pension System on or after February 1, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Optional Retirement Program - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Optional Retirement Program - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Optional Retirement Program - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Optional Retirement Program - Membership
House 2/22/2019 2/25/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Optional Retirement Program - Membership
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 46
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted 59A
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed 59A
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Text - Chapter - Optional Retirement Program - Membership
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   30-302, 30-303, 30-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM