Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Tourism Development Board - Grants
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Bromwell, and Fennell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the requirement that the Maryland Tourism Development Board provide grants to certain tourism organizations by including nongovernmental tourism organizations as authorized recipients of grants from the Board.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0628
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Tourism Development Board - Grants
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Tourism Development Board - Grants
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201, 4-214 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM