Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Annual Notice
Sponsored by
Delegates Crutchfield, Carr, Charles, Kelly, Kerr, and Sample-Hughes
Status
Veto sustained (0-138)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain carriers to provide each insured under a policy or contract of long-term care insurance in the State an annual notice, in writing or electronically, containing the insured's policy form number and the carrier's customer service telephone number.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0415
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Long-Term Care Insurance - Annual Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Long-Term Care Insurance - Annual Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-138)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Long-Term Care Insurance - Annual Notice
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
Text - Third - Long-Term Care Insurance - Annual Notice
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 57
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Referred Rules 59
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Veto sustained (0-138)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-117.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM