Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income Employees
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Anderson, Boyce, Bridges, Conaway, and Mosby
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the property tax imposed on dwellings in Baltimore City that are owned by low-income employees of Baltimore City who are employed on a full-time basis, are among the 25% lowest-paid city employees, and who own a dwelling in Baltimore City; providing that the credit may not exceed the lesser of $2,500 per dwelling or the amount of property tax imposed on the dwelling; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0464 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income Employees
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income Employees
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income Employees
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 56
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Referred Rules 58
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income Employees
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM