Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Arts and Culture Capital Grant Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Jones, and McIntosh
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Arts and Culture Capital Grant Program; requiring the Maryland State Arts Council to hire at least one full-time coordinator for the Program; requiring the Governor, for fiscal years 2021 through 2026, to include at least $12,000,000 for the Program in the budget; establishing certain criteria by which certain organizations may apply for a grant from the Program; providing that in any fiscal year an eligible organization may not receive a grant for a single project that exceeds $1,000,000; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Arts and Culture Capital Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Arts and Culture Capital Grant Program
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM