Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Wholesome Meat Act - Prohibitions - Equines and Equine Meat
Sponsored by
Delegate Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from buying, selling, transporting, or offering or receiving for sale or transportation any equine carcass or the meat of any equine if the person knows or reasonably should know that the carcass or meat will be used for human consumption; and prohibiting a person from buying, selling, transporting, or offering or receiving for sale or transportation any equine if the person knows or reasonably should know that the equine is intended for slaughter for human consumption.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2014 2/12/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-123 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM