Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Nontrial Convictions
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Barron, Hayes, R. Lewis, Lierman, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Defining the term "conviction" as it relates to the standard required to file a petition for writ of actual innocence by a person convicted at trial; establishing a standard required to file a petition for writ of actual innocence by a person convicted as a result of a guilty plea, an Alford plea, or a plea of nolo contendere; and requiring that a petition for actual innocence require a sworn affirmation by the petitioner that the petitioner is innocent.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0675
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {202019/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-44)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Nontrial Convictions
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {202019/1 Adopted 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Nontrial Convictions
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (96-44) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM