Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recreational Striped Bass Fishery - Study on Harvest Data
Sponsored by
Delegate Jacobs
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to conduct a study on methods of obtaining more accurate harvest data for the recreational striped bass fishery; requiring the study to examine certain issues relevant to obtaining more accurate harvest data for the recreational striped bass fishery; requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0882
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1148 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Recreational Striped Bass Fishery - Study on Harvest Data
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Recreational Striped Bass Fishery - Study on Harvest Data
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 1:05 PM