Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz, Ghrist, and Jacobs
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 463
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain residency requirement for an applicant for certain alcoholic beverages licenses in Queen Anne's County; and providing that an individual may not be issued a Class A beer, wine, and liquor license on behalf of a corporation or limited liability company unless the corporation or limited liability company is a Maryland entity in good standing or a foreign entity registered to do business in the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 463
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 463
Text - Chapter - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-102, 27-1403 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:33 PM