Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB1399


CH0464

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Use of Haul Seines
Sponsored by
Delegate Jacobs
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 464
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an exception to the prohibition against fishing with a haul seine; and providing that, if a haul seine is set on a Friday, a person may empty it during the period from 12:01 a.m. on the following Saturday until sunrise on the following Monday, if the person provides the Natural Resources Police with a certain notification, the location of the haul seine that will be emptied, and contact information for the tidal fish licensee who is responsible for the haul seine.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0510
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Use of Haul Seines
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {450319/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Use of Haul Seines
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 464
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Use of Haul Seines
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {450319/1 Adopted 46
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Use of Haul Seines
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 47A
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 464
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:18 PM