Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Construction Education and Innovation - Establishment of Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Barkley, Branch, Carey, Clippinger, Davis, Frick, Glenn, Jones, Kramer, Lisanti, Valderrama, Vaughn, and C. Wilson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Construction Education and Innovation Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; providing that the Fund may be used to support the purposes of the Maryland Center for Construction Education and Innovation; requiring the Governor, for fiscal year 2018 and each fiscal year thereafter, to include in the annual State budget an appropriation to the Fund of $250,000 to support the operation of the Center; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1130
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543197/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-21)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {419438/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-4)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-29)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {543197/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 51
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (116-21) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {419438/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-4) 54
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 57
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (108-29) 57
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Passed Enrolled 57
Post Passage 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 34
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1301 through 11-1302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM