Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development – Baltimore Symphony Orchestra – Funding and Workgroup (The John C. Merrill Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates McIntosh, Anderson, Boyce, Bridges, Conaway, Glenn, Haynes, Hettleman, Jalisi, Jones, Lafferty, R. Lewis, Lierman, Mosby, Rosenberg, Smith, Wells, and Solomon
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 743
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appropriate $1,600,000 to the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra in each of fiscal years 2020 and 2021; establishing the Workgroup on the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra; requiring the Workgroup to examine structural efficiencies of the Orchestra, including health care costs and facility usage; requiring the Workgroup to make recommendations regarding cost containment and audience development in a consolidated financial report to certain committees of the General Assembly by October 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {754767/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-29)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {789232/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-28)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 743
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Economic Development – Baltimore Symphony Orchestra – Funding and Workgroup
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {754767/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Economic Development – Baltimore Symphony Orchestra – Funding and Workgroup
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (106-29) 47
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {789232/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (109-28) 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Economic Development – Baltimore Symphony Orchestra – Funding and Workgroup (The John C. Merrill Act)
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 743
Text - Chapter - Economic Development – Baltimore Symphony Orchestra – Funding and Workgroup (The John C. Merrill Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM