Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Land Use – Comprehensive Plan – Middle Housing (Planning for Modest Homes Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegate Stewart
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a local jurisdiction to address middle housing as a component of the housing element of a certain plan; and requiring the housing element of a certain plan to state the number of additional housing units the local jurisdiction will need by a certain point in time based on certain forecasts.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {770819/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-35)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Land Use - Development - Middle Housing (Modest Home Choices Act of 2020)
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {770819/1 Adopted 46
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Land Use – Comprehensive Plan – Middle Housing (Planning for Modest Homes Act of 2020)
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (99-35) 47A
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-114 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:33 PM