Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Upper Potomac River Commission - Pension Plans
Sponsored by
Delegate Beitzel
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain trustees or officers of the Upper Potomac River Commission to invest and reinvest certain money in their custody or control in accordance with rules or procedures established by the Commission; requiring any pension plan controlled by the Commission on or after July 1, 2019, to adhere to the principles incorporated in the Uniform Management of Public Employee Retirement Systems Act that address the investment and management of funds for a public pension system; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Upper Potomac River Commission - Pension Plans
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Upper Potomac River Commission - Pension Plans
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Upper Potomac River Commission - Pension Plans
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Upper Potomac River Commission - Pension Plans
House 3/13/2019 3/14/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Text - Third - Upper Potomac River Commission - Pension Plans
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Referred Rules 61
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Text - Chapter - Upper Potomac River Commission - Pension Plans
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM