Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
CASH Campaign of Maryland Grant
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Cain, and Mosby
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual State budget for each fiscal year an appropriation of $200,000 for the CASH Campaign of Maryland to provide outreach, education, and free tax preparation services to promote the financial capability of low-income individuals and families; and specifying that the appropriations may be used to provide free volunteer tax assistance, financial education, connections to high quality financial services, education for service providers, and outreach to low-income individuals and families.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - CASH Campaign of Maryland Grant
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {104160/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - CASH Campaign of Maryland Grant
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-36)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-7)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - CASH Campaign of Maryland Grant
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - CASH Campaign of Maryland Grant
House 3/13/2019 3/14/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {104160/1 Adopted 58
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Text - Third - CASH Campaign of Maryland Grant
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (102-36) 60
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Referred Rules 61
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (38-7) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 745
Text - Chapter - CASH Campaign of Maryland Grant
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-801, 6-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM