Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Power Plant Research Program to conduct a study on the renewable energy portfolio standard and related matters; requiring the study to be a comprehensive review of the history, implementation, overall costs and benefits, and effectiveness of the renewable energy portfolio standard in relation to the energy policies of the State; requiring State and local units to cooperate in the conduct of the study; requiring the Program to report to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly by specified dates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1146
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633290/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {647378/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {573229/1 (Senator Madaleno) Withdrawn
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {403027/1 (Senator Hershey) Withdrawn
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {633290/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Finance 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {647378/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 60
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {573229/1 (Senator Madaleno) Withdrawn 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {403027/1 (Senator Hershey) Withdrawn 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Text - Chapter - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-714 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM