Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Water Systems - Supplier Requirements (Water Quality Accountability Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegate Miller
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a supplier of water to inspect certain valves in a public water system in a certain manner, repair or replace certain valves, inspect certain fire hydrants, formulate and implement a certain plan, identify the locations of certain valves, and record certain characteristics and identifiers of certain valves; requiring a supplier of water to develop a certain cybersecurity program by February 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0820
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Public Water Systems - Supplier Requirements (Water Quality Accountability Act of 2020)
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-401,   9-429 through 9-437 )
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 10:25 AM