Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Task Force on Missing Persons
Sponsored by
Delegates Proctor, Acevero, D. Barnes, Chang, Crosby, Fennell, Hill, Ivey, Korman, Lehman, J. Lewis, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, and Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Missing Persons to study best practices for conducting searches for missing persons and review the options for the establishment of a State Coordinator for Missing Persons to serve as a point of contact for the families of missing persons; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Task Force on Missing Persons
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Public Safety - Task Force on Missing Persons
House 4/01/2019 4/02/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM