Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegate Lisanti
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an insurer that issues or delivers in the State a policy of motor vehicle liability insurance that provides coverage for the repair of physical damage to the insured motor vehicle to provide in the policy that the insured has the option of requiring repairs to be made to the insured motor vehicle using genuine crash parts, certified aftermarket crash parts, or aftermarket crash parts; authorizing the insured to consent in a certain manner to the use of certain aftermarket crash parts; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1258 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-908 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:34 PM