Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a specified designee who may conduct a specified assessment to be certified or licensed, rather than certified and licensed; authorizing a person serving a specified term of confinement for an offense relating to volume dealing in cocaine base imposed on or before September 30, 2017, to file a motion to modify or reduce the sentence under specified circumstances; altering the membership of the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {872517/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-23)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {872517/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (117-23) 51
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601, 5-609.1, 5-612.1 )
(   9-3202, 9-3203 )
(   16-303, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM