Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services – Division of Parole and Probation
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating the intent of the General Assembly that, in accordance with a certain risk and needs assessment administered by the Division of Parole and Probation in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, the active caseload of a parole and probation agent may not exceed a certain number of cases requiring a certain level of supervision; and requiring the Division to submit a certain report on or before December 1, 2020, regarding certain activities undertaken by the Division.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services – Division of Parole and Probation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services – Division of Parole and Probation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:34 PM