Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Wilson, Aumann, Barkley, Brooks, Buckel, Chang, Fennell, Folden, Hill, Hixson, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jones, McComas, McDonough, McMillan, Morgan, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Queen, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Sanchez, Turner, Valentino-Smith, Afzali, Ali, D. Barnes, Ebersole, C. Howard, Kaiser, J. Lewis, Long, Luedtke, Mosby, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an income tax checkoff for voluntary contributions to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund; requiring the Comptroller to include a checkoff on the individual income tax return; requiring the Comptroller to collect and account for contributions made through the checkoff and to credit the proceeds to the Fund after deducting the amount necessary to administer the checkoff; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0296
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0780 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {315668/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {315668/1 Adopted 43
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 44
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-804, 2-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM